TX HB2192 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to comprehensive information security assessments on state agency information resources and network systems and digital data storage and security.
Title
Relating to comprehensive information security assessments on state agency information resources and network systems and digital data storage and security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2192 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02192I.htm |