TX HB2191 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mobile source emissions reductions and transportation electrification.
Title
Relating to mobile source emissions reductions and transportation electrification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2508 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2508 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2508 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
ELECTRIC VEHICLES
Electronic Information Systems
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Electronic Information Systems
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--General