TX HB2171 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Center for Rural Health Education at The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Center for Rural Health Education at The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] | Rep. Erin Gamez [D] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Janie Lopez [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1624 (Y: 118 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1624 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Amended 1-Guerra |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--Rural
RURAL HEALTH CARE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--Rural
RURAL HEALTH CARE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM