TX HB217 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain persons to defer or abate the collection of ad valorem taxes on a person's residence homestead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain persons to defer or abate the collection of ad valorem taxes on a person's residence homestead.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - HB 217 Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-08SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-05HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-04HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Finance
2017-04-24SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseRecord vote
2017-04-13HousePassed
2017-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-03-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-03-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback