TX HB216 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain boarding home facilities and assisted living facilities; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain boarding home facilities and assisted living facilities; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Sen. Eliot Shapleigh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-25 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-25 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-25 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-23 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-01 | Amended | |
2009-05-01 | Amended | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
WHISTLEBLOWERS
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Nursing Homes
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
WHISTLEBLOWERS