TX HB2155 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abolition of the equine incentive program.
Title
Relating to the abolition of the equine incentive program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2155 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02155I.htm |