TX HB2154 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of physical fitness programs and standards for law enforcement officers employed by the office of the attorney general.
Title
Relating to the adoption of physical fitness programs and standards for law enforcement officers employed by the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1005 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1005 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions