TX HB2153 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to certain registration requirements imposed on sex offenders.
Title
Relating to certain registration requirements imposed on sex offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-10 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2396 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - No action taken in subcommittee