TX HB2139 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the offense of engaging in organized election fraud activity.
Title
Relating to the creation of the offense of engaging in organized election fraud activity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2139 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02139I.htm |