TX HB2131 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of insurance adjusters.
Title
Relating to the regulation of insurance adjusters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions