TX HB213 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain loans secured by a lien on residential real property and to other transactions involving residential real property; providing civil penalties.
Title
Relating to certain loans secured by a lien on residential real property and to other transactions involving residential real property; providing civil penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. James Keffer [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Vicki Truitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept. | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-20 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-18 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-18 | Amended | |
2011-04-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
MORTGAGE BROKERS & BANKERS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
MORTGAGE BROKERS & BANKERS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF