TX HB2111 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transitional living services program for certain youth in foster care.
Title
Relating to the transitional living services program for certain youth in foster care.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Strama [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - HB 2111Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FOOD
FOSTER CARE
Health
Health--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NUTRITION
FOOD
FOSTER CARE
Health
Health--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NUTRITION