TX HB2107 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-31)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and cannabis testing facilities; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and cannabis testing facilities; authorizing fees.

Sponsors

Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Dawnna Dukes [D]
Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback