TX HB21 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-12)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school finance, including funding for the recruitment and retention of teachers and the support of participants in the public school employees group insurance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school finance, including funding for the recruitment and retention of teachers and the support of participants in the public school employees group insurance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#173 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - Rules suspended RV#172 (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#72 (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Read 2nd time RV#67 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#38 (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 See remarks for effective date
2017-08-16 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-16 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-15HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-15SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-08-15HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-15HouseRecord vote
2017-08-15HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-08-15HousePoint of order overruled
2017-08-15HouseMotion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseRecord vote
2017-08-15HouseRules suspended
2017-08-15House1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
2017-08-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-08-15SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenatePassed
2017-08-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-08-14SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-08-14SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmendment amended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-08-14SenateVote reconsidered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14SenateAmended
2017-08-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-14SenateRead 2nd time
2017-08-14SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-08-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-08-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-08SenateReferred to Education
2017-08-08SenateRead first time
2017-08-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-07HouseRecord vote
2017-08-07HousePassed
2017-08-07HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-04HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-02HouseRecord vote
2017-08-02HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2017-08-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-31HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-07-31HouseRecommitted to committee
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00021I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00021H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00021E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00021S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00021F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21&RcdVtNo=38&Ch=H&Dt=08/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21&RcdVtNo=67&Ch=H&Dt=08/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21&RcdVtNo=72&Ch=H&Dt=08/07/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21&RcdVtNo=172&Ch=H&Dt=08/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB21&RcdVtNo=173&Ch=H&Dt=08/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback