TX HB2087 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to mandatory arbitration for certain municipal fire departments and employee bargaining agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to mandatory arbitration for certain municipal fire departments and employee bargaining agents.

Sponsors

Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]
Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. James White [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback