TX HB2087 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Postponed
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Postponed
Summary
Relating to the state's statutory and contractual liens to secure the payment of unpaid royalty and other amounts due under oil and gas leases of state land.
Title
Relating to the state's statutory and contractual liens to secure the payment of unpaid royalty and other amounts due under oil and gas leases of state land.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Homer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Postponed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1823 (Same As) 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee