TX HB2082 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the validation of a home-rule charter for certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the validation of a home-rule charter for certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-12 Laid on the table subject to call
2011-05-12 Companion considered in lieu of
2011-05-11 Placed on General State Calendar
2011-05-09 Considered in Calendars
2011-05-05 Committee report sent to Calendars
2011-05-05 Committee report distributed
2011-05-05 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-05-04 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2011-05-04 Considered in formal meeting
2011-04-13 Left pending in committee
2011-04-13 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-04-13 Considered in public hearing
2011-04-13 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-03-08 Referred to Urban Affairs
2011-03-08 Read first time
2011-03-02 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback