TX HB2075 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to limitations on the number of courses that students may drop under certain circumstances at certain public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to limitations on the number of courses that students may drop under certain circumstances at certain public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Brown [R] | Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. Mark Shelton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS