TX HB2068 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; authorizing and increasing criminal fines.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; authorizing and increasing criminal fines.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Phillips [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#928 (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#860 (Y: 122 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#860 (Y: 122 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road