TX HB2053 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate passage reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the enforcement of workers' compensation compliance and practice requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement of workers' compensation compliance and practice requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - HB 2053 Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-01SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-19HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback