TX HB2053 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to temporarily holding certain arrested persons in municipal jails.
Title
Relating to temporarily holding certain arrested persons in municipal jails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--General
City Government--General
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--General