TX HB2051 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of public institutions of higher education to make certain investments to support technology commercialization.
Title
Relating to the authority of public institutions of higher education to make certain investments to support technology commercialization.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Daniel Branch [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Science & Technology
Business & Commerce--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Science & Technology