TX HB205 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures for ordering the required participation in services in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for ordering the required participation in services in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-14HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-02-14HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback