TX HB2039 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating an early childhood certification to teach students in prekindergarten through grade three.
Title
Relating to creating an early childhood certification to teach students in prekindergarten through grade three.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Linda Koop [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#638 (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#638 (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR