TX HB2027 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information regarding the procedures and available resources for the sealing of juvenile records.
Title
Relating to information regarding the procedures and available resources for the sealing of juvenile records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#466 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#466 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
INTERNET
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Crimes--Juvenile
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
INTERNET
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
STATE BAR OF TEXAS