TX HB2021 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the acceptance, rejection, and uses of certain money provided by the federal government to this state.
Title
Relating to the acceptance, rejection, and uses of certain money provided by the federal government to this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATION OF FEDERAL FUNDS, BOARD OF
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control