TX HB2017 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the organization, governance, duties, and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Relating to the organization, governance, duties, and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed | |
2011-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed as amended | |
2011-04-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Amended | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Amended | |
2011-04-19 | Amended | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
DIGITAL SIGNATURES
INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
DIGITAL SIGNATURES
INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration