TX HB2015 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the proper classification of workers performing services in connection with governmental contracts; providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the proper classification of workers performing services in connection with governmental contracts; providing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-04 - House - HB 2015Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 1/1/14
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-04HouseRecord vote
2013-05-04HousePassed
2013-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2013-03-05HouseRead first time
2013-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback