TX HB2012 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Title
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB804 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars