TX HB2012 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to occupational license application and examination fees for certain military service members, military veterans, and military spouses.
Title
Relating to occupational license application and examination fees for certain military service members, military veterans, and military spouses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2012 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02012I.htm |