TX HB2012 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the criminal consequences of operating without a valid driver's license a motor vehicle for which financial responsibility is not established.
Title
Relating to the criminal consequences of operating without a valid driver's license a motor vehicle for which financial responsibility is not established.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Dan Gattis [R] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] |
Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Allen Vaught [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Point of order overruled | |
2009-05-14 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-14 | Postponed | |
2009-05-14 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
ERIC'S LAW
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
ERIC'S LAW
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility