TX HB2008 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to deferred presentment transactions made to military borrowers.
Title
Relating to deferred presentment transactions made to military borrowers.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cosper [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#914 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#914 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |