TX HB2008 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an agreement between the Department of Public Safety and a county clerk or county assessor-collector for the provision of renewal and duplicate driver's license and other identification certificate services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an agreement between the Department of Public Safety and a county clerk or county assessor-collector for the provision of renewal and duplicate driver's license and other identification certificate services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2013-03-05HouseRead first time
2013-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback