TX HB2004 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the determination of certain exemptions from the administration of state assessment instruments to public school students and to the consideration of the performance of certain students on state assessment instruments.
Title
Relating to the determination of certain exemptions from the administration of state assessment instruments to public school students and to the consideration of the performance of certain students on state assessment instruments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ACADEMIC PERFORMANCE
Aliens
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Aliens
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing