TX HB20 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to censorship of or certain other interference with digital expression, including expression on social media platforms or through electronic mail messages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to censorship of or certain other interference with digital expression, including expression on social media platforms or through electronic mail messages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#141 (Y: 78 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#95 (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#86 (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#85 (Y: 49 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#84 (Y: 48 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#83 (Y: 43 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 30) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
2021-09-09 Signed by the Governor
2021-09-03 Sent to the Governor
2021-09-02HouseSigned in the House
2021-09-02SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-09-02SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-09-02HouseReported enrolled
2021-09-02HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-09-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-09-02HouseRecord vote RV#141
2021-09-02HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-09-01HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-09-01HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-09-01HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-08-31SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-08-31SenateRecord vote
2021-08-31SenatePassed
2021-08-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-31SenateRecord vote
2021-08-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-31SenateRecord vote
2021-08-31SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-08-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-31SenateAmended
2021-08-31SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-08-31SenateRead 2nd time
2021-08-31SenateRecord vote
2021-08-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-08-31SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-08-31SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-08-31SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-08-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-08-30SenateRead first time
2021-08-30SenateReceived from the House
2021-08-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-08-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseRecord vote RV#95
2021-08-30HousePassed
2021-08-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-08-27HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#86
2021-08-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-08-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 6-Dominguez
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#85
2021-08-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 5-Rosenthal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#84
2021-08-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Rosenthal
2021-08-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#83
2021-08-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Howard
2021-08-27HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Biedermann
2021-08-27HouseAmended 1-Cain
2021-08-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-08-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-08-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-08-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB90 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Left pending in committee
SB90 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00020I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00020H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00020E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00020S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00020F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020H26.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00020S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/HB00020H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/HB00020E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=83&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=84&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=85&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=86&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=95&Ch=H&Dt=08/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-31-F.PDF#page=33
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-31-F.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=141&Ch=H&Dt=09/02/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback