TX HB20 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to rules for fixing the amount of bail, to the release of certain defendants on a bail bond or personal bond, to related duties of certain officers taking bail bonds and of a magistrate in a criminal case, to charitable bail organizations, and to the reporting of information pertaining to bail bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to rules for fixing the amount of bail, to the release of certain defendants on a bail bond or personal bond, to related duties of certain officers taking bail bonds and of a magistrate in a criminal case, to charitable bail organizations, and to the reporting of information pertaining to bail bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#651 (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 551
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateRules suspended
2021-05-30HouseCorrected Conference Committee Report distributed
2021-05-30HouseCorrected Conference Committee Report distributed
2021-05-30HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-30SenateCorrected Conference committee report filed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#651
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03HouseAmended 10-Wu
2021-05-03HouseAmended 9-A. Johnson
2021-05-03HouseAmended 8-Canales
2021-05-03HouseAmended 7-Moody
2021-05-03HouseAmended 6-Murr
2021-05-03HouseAmended 5-Murr
2021-05-03HouseAmended 4-Murr
2021-05-03HouseAmended 3-Murr
2021-05-03HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Murr
2021-05-03HouseAmendment amended 2-Moody
2021-05-03HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Murr
2021-05-03HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-04-27HousePostponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB21 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
SB21 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB20
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00020I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00020H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00020E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00020S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H26.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H27.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H28.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H29.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020H210.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00020S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00020H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00020E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00020S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00020S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB20&RcdVtNo=651&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=38
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=39
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=42

Bill Comments 750

feedback