TX HB20 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-15)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the state highway fund and to the management and investment of the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the Texas legacy distribution fund.
Title
Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the state highway fund and to the management and investment of the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the Texas legacy distribution fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#601 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#548 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#548 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#601 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-24 | House | Postponed 4/24/19 11:45 AM |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#548 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR10 (Enabling for) 2019-04-24 - Received from the House
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND