TX HB20 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the review, oversight, and reporting of certain state agency contracts and the assessment of certain state agency projects.
Title
Relating to the review, oversight, and reporting of certain state agency contracts and the assessment of certain state agency projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#634 (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Electronic Information Systems
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Electronic Information Systems
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions