TX HB2 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to rules for setting the amount of bail, to the release of certain defendants on a monetary bond or personal bond, to related duties of certain officers taking bail bonds and of a magistrate in a criminal case, to charitable bail organizations, and to the reporting of information pertaining to bail bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to rules for setting the amount of bail, to the release of certain defendants on a monetary bond or personal bond, to related duties of certain officers taking bail bonds and of a magistrate in a criminal case, to charitable bail organizations, and to the reporting of information pertaining to bail bonds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-07-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-07-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-07-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-07-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-07-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-07-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-07-08HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
2021-07-08HouseRead first time
2021-07-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB6 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - Co-author authorized
SB6 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback