TX HB2 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain riders for the Texas Medical Board and the Texas State Board of Examiners of Psychologists from the General Appropriations Act that are contingent upon the approval of certain Acts continuing those agencies during the 85th Regular Session.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain riders for the Texas Medical Board and the Texas State Board of Examiners of Psychologists from the General Appropriations Act that are contingent upon the approval of certain Acts continuing those agencies during the 85th Regular Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#17 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#9 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#9 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-07-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-28 | House | Passed |
2017-07-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-07-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-07-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget