TX HB2 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making supplemental appropriations and giving direction and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.
Title
Relating to making supplemental appropriations and giving direction and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. James Keffer [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Rep. Jimmie Aycock [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 by Howard (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 by Howard (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - HB 2Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-20 | Signed by the Governor/line item veto | |
2015-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Comptroller | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const. |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-01 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2015-04-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2015-04-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-04-01 | House | Amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | Amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | House | Amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2015-03-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |