TX HB1995 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas Uniform Trade Secrets Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas Uniform Trade Secrets Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-09SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-09HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-08HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-08HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenatePassed
2017-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-08SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-02SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-02SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback