TX HB1994 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the curriculum requirements for public high school students.
Title
Relating to the curriculum requirements for public high school students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1994 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01994I.htm |