TX HB1986 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of regional transit authorities; granting the power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds and charge fees; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the creation of regional transit authorities; granting the power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds and charge fees; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#894 (Y: 111 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit