TX HB1979 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to strategic partnerships for the continuation of certain water districts annexed by a municipality.
Title
Relating to strategic partnerships for the continuation of certain water districts annexed by a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-09 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-02 | Postponed | |
2011-05-02 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-26 | Postponed | |
2011-04-26 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-19 | Postponed | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Soil & Water Conservation
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Soil & Water Conservation
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility