TX HB1968 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the estates of decedents.
Title
Relating to the estates of decedents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |