TX HB1964 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedure for action on certain applications for an amendment to a water right.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedure for action on certain applications for an amendment to a water right.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#294 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#294
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-10HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback