TX HB1963 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 87 as the Texas Game Warden Michael C. Pauling Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 87 as the Texas Game Warden Michael C. Pauling Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1963Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-13 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
PORT ARTHUR, CITY OF
SABINE PASS, CITY OF
TEXAS GAME WARDEN MICHAEL C. PAULING MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
PORT ARTHUR, CITY OF
SABINE PASS, CITY OF
TEXAS GAME WARDEN MICHAEL C. PAULING MEMORIAL HIGHWAY