TX HB1959 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain public school students who are children of peace officers.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain public school students who are children of peace officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#345 |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2339 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Public Education
HB2339 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Public Education
HB2339 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
TRANSFER STUDENTS