TX HB1957 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the treatment of political contributions by a person's spouse under the Judicial Campaign Fairness Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the treatment of political contributions by a person's spouse under the Judicial Campaign Fairness Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#893 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-15HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback